IL HB3881 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Program Act and the Cannabis Regulation and Tax Act. Requires each Department responsible for licensing of a cannabis business establishment or registration or licensing of a cultivation center or dispensing organization under the Acts to publish on the Department's website a list of the ownership information of the applicants, registrants, or licensees under the Department's jurisdiction. Effective immediately.
Title
CANNABIS-OWNERSHIP INFORMATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | First Reading |
2019-09-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-09-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 130 | 93 | New Code | See Bill Text |
410 | 705 | 55-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3881&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3881.htm |