IL HB3881 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on July 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0843
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on July 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0843
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Electrologist Licensing Act. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may issue a license to an individual who failed to apply for licensure on or before February 22, 2006, but who otherwise meets the qualifications, provided that the individual submits a completed application for licensure as required within 90 days after the effective date of this amendatory Act of the 97th General Assembly. Effective immediately.
Title
ELECTROLOGIST ACT-LICENSE REQ
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 63 N: 49 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0843 |
2012-07-23 | House | Effective Date July 23, 2012 |
2012-06-29 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-31 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-05-30 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 063-049-006 |
2012-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Environmental Health Committee; 011-007-000 |
2012-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Environmental Health Committee |
2012-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly du Buclet |
2012-05-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard |
2012-05-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-05-24 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May |
2012-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. |
2012-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Cunningham |
2012-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May |
2012-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2012-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2012-05-24 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2012-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2012-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-017-001 |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed May 23, 2012 |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Michael Noland |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Annazette R. Collins |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2012 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2012 |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 013-000-000 |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2012-05-04 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 25, 2012 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 27, 2012 |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro |
2012-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2012-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 006-000-000 |
2012-02-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2012-02-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano |
2012-02-06 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2011-11-09 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2011-11-09 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2011-11-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-11-09 | House | First Reading |
2011-11-09 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2011-11-09 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2011-11-09 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2011-11-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 412 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |