IL HB3878 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Use Tax Act and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides a hunting sales tax holiday on specified dates for firearms and firearm ammunition that may be used for lawful hunting under the Wildlife Code. Provides for administration of the hunting sales tax holiday by the Department of Revenue. Provides the Department of Revenue with rulemaking authority, including emergency rulemaking authority. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act to allow emergency rulemaking. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HUNTING SALES TAX HOLIDAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseTo Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351053-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351053-6.5New CodeSee Bill Text
351202-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-8.5New CodeSee Bill Text
51005-45Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback