IL HB3871 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Budget Law. Provides for a continuing appropriation for funding of public education and human services. Amends the State Comptroller Act. Provides that if any cash flow deficit resulting from timing variation between disbursement and receipt of funds in the General Revenue Fund is anticipated, the Comptroller's efforts to manage timing variations shall include issuing payments for education and human services before issuing payments for financial services. Amends the State Treasurer Act. Provides that when any warrant is presented to the State Treasurer to be countersigned, he shall do so if the warrant is in proper form, there are sufficient moneys in the fund to pay the warrant, and payments for education and human services have been issued. Amends the General Obligation Bond Act. Provides that the irrevocable and continuing authority to appropriate funds under the Act shall cover payments to bondholders, but shall not cover fees for credit enhancements or net payments on interest rate swap agreements, or financial futures contracts associated with General Obligation Bonds. Defines terms.
Title
STATE GOV-PRIORITY OF PAYMENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-06-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-05-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 006-004-000 |
2017-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-05-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-04-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-03-31 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 20 | 50-23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 20 | 50-24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 405 | 9.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 505 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 330 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |