IL HB3865 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Teachers Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires an individual to be a member of the Teachers' Retirement System of the State of Illinois before the effective date of the amendatory Act in order for specified service as an officer or employee of a statewide teacher organization or as an officer of a national teacher organization to qualify as service as a teacher under the Code. Provides that any person whose membership in the Teachers' Retirement System of the State of Illinois is derived solely from employment as a substitute teacher and employment with a statewide teacher organization shall forfeit service credit in the System. Requires a refund of contributions made by those persons. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-TRS-LEAVES OF ABSENCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 8, 2013 |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 3, 2013 |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2012-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). |
2012-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). |
2012-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). |
2012-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Held in Executive |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Held in Executive |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Held in Executive |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno; -Brady |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2012-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2012-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2012 |
2012-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2012 |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Pensions and Investments; 007-002-000 |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Pensions and Investments |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Pensions and Investments |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Postponed - Pensions and Investments |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Pensions and Investments |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2012-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(c-1) - Referred to Pensions and Investments |
2012-05-04 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 25, 2012 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Pensions and Investments |
2012-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Held in Pensions and Investments |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions and Investments |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-11-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-11-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2011-11-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-11-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2011-11-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2011-11-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ren |
2011-11-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2011-11-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2011-11-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2011-11-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2011-11-09 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2011-11-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2011-11-09 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2011-11-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-11-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-11-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-11-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Winters |
2011-11-08 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-11-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-11-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-11-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 |
2011-11-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2011-11-02 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2011-11-02 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2011 |
2011-10-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-10-27 | House | First Reading |
2011-10-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 16-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-106.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |