IL HB3853 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-17 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-17 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote Act.
Title
POPULAR VOTE AGREEMENT-REPEAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | First Reading |
2019-08-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-07-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-07-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-07-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 20 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3853&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3853.htm |