IL HB3853 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Defines "third-party provider". Establishes additional reporting requirements for third-party providers. Provides that a violation of certain reporting requirements is a Class C misdemeanor. Requires employees of a third-party provider to post with the State Commission a bond payable to the State in the penalty of $1,000 upon the condition that the person will not unlawfully transport or deliver alcoholic liquor within or into this State. Requires a bill of lading or other memorandum of shipment signed by the winery shipper's licensee to contain, among other information, a description of the wine being transported, the name and address of the consignor and consignee, and the route to be traveled by the vehicle transporting the wine. Requires the route to be the most direct route. Requires payment for any wine shipped by a third-party provider to be received no later than at the time of delivery, and, as a condition of delivery, a third-party provider must obtain the signature of a person 21 years of age or more. In each shipment of wine, requires the third-party provider to include written information concerning fetal alcohol syndrome. Provides that certain restrictions on the manufacture, importation for distribution, transportation from outside the State into the State, and distribution or sale of alcoholic liquor without a license under the Act do not apply to a third-party provider. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR-THIRD-PARTY PROVIDERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 005-004-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported Back To Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; |
2017-03-29 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-03-08 | House | To Business Licenses Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 10-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |