IL HB3852 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Sexual Assault Survivors Emergency Treatment Act. Defines "eligible health care facility" as a hospital, emergency department, or outpatient clinic that delivers health care, including, but not limited to, care for a sexual assault survivor. Changes references from "hospital" to "eligible health care facility" and makes conforming changes. Changes references from "hospital emergency services" to "emergency services". Provides that sexual assault nurse examiners who examine pediatric patients should have completed specified training and have a specified certification. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
SEX ASSAULT EMERGENCY SERVICES
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Unes [R] | Rep. Cynthia Soto [D] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] |
Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 016-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 70 | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 70 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 70 | 2.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 70 | 2.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 70 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 70 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 70 | 5.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 70 | 6.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 70 | 6.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 70 | 6.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 70 | 6.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 70 | 6.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 70 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 70 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 70 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 70 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |