IL HB3851 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Township Code. Provides that the corporate authorities of a home rule municipality may, by resolution, provide that the municipality is organized as a coterminous city (currently, only a county board may organize territory into a coterminous city). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TWP CD-COTERMINOUS CITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-03-29HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 009-004-000
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
60115-10Amended CodeCitation Text
60115-5.1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback