IL HB3839 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code, the Code of Civil Procedure, the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act, the Non-Support Punishment Act, and the Illinois Parentage Act of 1984 to provide that no child support order entered on or after the effective date shall accrue interest and that interest on orders entered prior to the effective date shall no longer accrue interest after the effective date.
Title
CHILD SUPPORT-PROHIBIT INTERST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2012-02-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2012-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2012-02-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2011-10-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-10-19 | House | First Reading |
2011-10-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 10-16.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 12-109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 16 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 16 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 45 | 20.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 504 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 505 | Amended Code | Citation Text |