IL HB3830 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Radon Industry Licensing Act. Provides that persons who perform testing for radon or radon progeny must report the results of that testing to their clients, owners or occupants (under certain circumstances), and the Nuclear Safety Division of the Illinois Emergency Management Agency (now, just to clients and (under certain circumstances) owners or occupants). Requires the Agency to report certain radon testing results to municipalities or counties.
Title
NUCLEAR SAFETY-RADON-REPORTING
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Reitz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2009-04-22 | Motion Prevailed by Voice Vote | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-31 | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-26 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment & Energy Committee; 019-000-000 | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-25 | First Reading | |
2009-02-25 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Reitz |