IL HB3824 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law in the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for the 2022 and 2023 levy year, the term "taxing district" means all taxing districts in the State, including home rule units, but does not include a taxing district with a population of less than 25,000, unless that taxing district was subject to the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law on the effective date of the amendatory Act or was made subject to the Law by referendum. Provides that, for the 2022 and 2023 levy year, the extension limitation is 0% or the rate of increase approved by the voters. Limits home rule powers. Effective immediately.
Title
PTELL-FREEZE
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] |
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2022-01-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 18-185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-242 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3824&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3824.htm |