IL HB3824 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Governmental and Governmental Employees Tort Immunity Act. Adds to the existing purposes (tort liability, insurance and risk management) for which an extraordinary tort liability tax levy may be imposed the installation and maintenance of sprinkler or other fire suppression systems that meet national standards and are certified by the local fire officials. Declares, as a matter of policy, that the use of tort liability tax revenue for the installation and maintenance of sprinkler or other fire suppression systems is appropriate because of the safety benefits of fire suppression systems, the associated reduction in potential exposure to tort liability claims, and the reduction in insurance costs achievable for facilities equipped with fire suppression systems. Adds to the existing purposes (insurance, specified types of judgments, settlements, and obligations, and risk management programs) for which a local public entity may annually levy: to pay the cost of the installation and maintenance of sprinkler or other fire suppression systems.
Title
GOV TORT LIABILITY LEVY-FIRE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-24 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-10-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-10-05 | House | First Reading |
2011-09-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
745 | 10 | 9-107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3824&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB3824.htm |