IL HB3816 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on January 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on January 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Gubernatorial Boards and Commissions Act. Provides that if a board or commission has not met at least once during a period of 2 consecutive years, then the board or commission is dissolved immediately after that 2-year period. Effective immediately.
Title
DISSOLVE INACTIVE BDS & COMMNS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-07 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-07 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-07 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1151 |
2013-01-25 | House | Some Sections have an Effective Date of June 30, 2013 |
2013-01-25 | House | Effective Date January 25, 2013 |
2013-01-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-01-11 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-01-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2013-01-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2013-01-07 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-01-07 | House | House Concurs |
2013-01-07 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 109-002-002 |
2013-01-07 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-002-002 |
2013-01-07 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-01-07 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-01-06 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-01-06 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-01-06 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-06 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-01-06 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-06 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-01-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 3 |
2013-01-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 035-018-000 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Holmes |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-002-000 |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Executive |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading December 4, 2012 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 29, 2012 |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 010-003-001 |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2012-11-21 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2012-11-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 8, 2013 |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2012-05-04 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 25, 2012 |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2012-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-008-000 |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2012-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-03-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2012-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2012-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2012-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-07 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 017-001-000 |
2012-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2012-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2012-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2012-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2012-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2012-02-29 | House | Remains in State Government Administration Committee |
2012-02-29 | House | Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost State Government Administration Committee; 006-010-000 |
2012-02-22 | House | Remains in State Government Administration Committee |
2012-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2012-02-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2012-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley |
2012-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2012-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2012-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2012-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2012-01-24 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-10-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-10-05 | House | First Reading |
2011-09-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |