IL HB3801 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that before the youth is released on aftercare release, the Department of Juvenile Justice shall require the youth to attend a restorative justice circle or family group conferencing session to ensure appropriate family support and a smooth transition upon his or her return home and into his or her community.
Title
CD CORR-DJJ-PREP AFTERCARE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | House | Tabled |
2017-05-15 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-04-07 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-2.5-70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3801&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3801.htm |