IL HB3797 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, the Code of Civil Procedure, and the Workers' Compensation Act. Makes numerous changes concerning the following in relation to workers' compensation: plans by the Department of Central Management Services for State employees, creation of the State Workers' Compensation Program Advisory Board, subpoenas, Commissioner and arbitrator standards of conduct, employee leasing companies, citations, construction employer collective bargaining, negotiated rate, wage differential, preferred provider programs, permanent partial disability, out-of-state fees, fee schedules, electronic claims, utilization review programs, employee intoxication, Commissioner qualifications, the Workers' Compensation Advisory Board, arbitrator appointments, prohibitions on gifts, claims brought by commission employees, carpal tunnel syndrome, fraud, sentencing, advisory premium rates, and insurance oversight. Makes other changes. Contains a severability provision. Effective immediately.
Title
WORKERS' COMP-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Kay [R] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Evans |
2011-10-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-10-05 | House | First Reading |
2011-07-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 405 | 405-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 405 | 405-411 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 405 | 64.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 8-802 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 1.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 305 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 13.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 16b | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 305 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 18.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 305 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 25.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 29.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 305 | 29.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 305 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 4b | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 305 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 8.1a | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 305 | 8.1b | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 305 | 8.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 8.2a | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 305 | 8.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3797&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB3797.htm |