IL HB3796 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that the regulation of the possession or ownership of a rifle or shotgun (rather than assault weapons) are exclusive powers and functions of this State. Provides that any ordinance or regulation, or portion of that ordinance or regulation, that purports to regulate the possession or ownership of any rifle or shotgun (rather than assault weapons) in a manner that is inconsistent with this Act, shall be invalid. Deletes provision that an ordinance or regulation enacted on, before, or within 10 days after the effective date of Public Act 98-63 (July 9, 2013) regulating the possession or ownership of assault weapons is valid. Effective immediately.
Title
FIREARM OWNERS ID-PREEMPT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-07-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 13.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3796&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3796.htm |