IL HB3791 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Passed on September 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0507
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Passed on September 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0507
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Securities Law of 1953. Includes certain agents of title insurance companies and registered broker-dealers and registered investment advisors within the scope of the term "qualified escrowee". With respect to certain exempt transactions, removes a requirement that the dealer be organized under Illinois Law, authorizes the payment of finders fees, and make other changes. Permits an Internet Portal to accept equity as payment if specified conditions are met.
Title
SECURITIES REGISTERED INTERNET
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-25 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0507 |
2017-09-15 | House | Effective Date June 1, 2018 |
2017-09-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-07-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-06-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-06-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-06-25 | House | House Concurs |
2017-06-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 101-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2017-05-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-001 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; T. Cullerton |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Financial Institutions; 006-000-000 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2017 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 007-000-000 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-04-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-05 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business Growth & Incentives Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business Growth & Incentives Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business Growth & Incentives Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-03-07 | House | Re-assigned to Business Growth & Incentives Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 5 | 2.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 5 | 8d | Amended Code | Citation Text |