IL HB3786 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0501
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0501
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code. Provides that when an initial investigation of a reported allegation of abuse, neglect or financial exploitation of a recipient of services indicates, based upon credible evidence, that an employee of a mental health or developmental disability facility is the perpetrator of the abuse, that employee shall immediately be barred from any further contact with recipients of services of the facility. Provides that an employee barred from contact with recipients of services shall remain barred: (1) pending the outcome of any further investigation, prosecution or disciplinary action against the employee; or (2) until the Department of Human Services Office of Inspector General independently determines that the allegation or allegations against the employee will be unsubstantiated or unfounded in the Office of Inspector General's final investigative report. Defines "credible evidence".
Title
MHDD CD-RECIPIENT ABUSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0501 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 27, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 26, 2021 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Do Pass Behavioral and Mental Health; 010-000-000 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Assigned to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 30, 2021 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 28, 2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 099-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2021-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 5 | 3-210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |