IL HB3786 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago School District Article of the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the application of the Article and definitions.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
Rep. Gregory Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-03-21 | House | To SPECIAL Issues Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-22 | House | To Special Issues Subcommittee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-03-07 | House | Re-assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 34-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |