IL HB3774 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Aircraft Landing and Taking Off Restriction Act. Defines "roadable aircraft". Provides that roadable aircraft shall be required to take off and land from a suitable airstrip and shall be prohibited from taking off and landing from any public roadway, unless under conditions of an emergency. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Defines "roadable aircraft" as an aircraft that has a method of propulsion which allows wheeled travel on roads and highways and is manufactured to meet the federal safety standards of motorcycles. Provides that a roadable aircraft shall be considered a motor vehicle while in operation on the roadways of the State. Exempts roadable aircraft from certificate of title requirements. Provides that roadable aircraft shall be identified using the federally issued tail number and may, but shall not be required to, display an additional license plate. Provides that roadable aircraft shall be issued one annual registration sticker and provides for the display of the registration sticker. Exempts roadable aircraft from motor vehicle inspection requirements.
Title
ROADABLE AIRCRAFT
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Jacobs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Paul Jacobs |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
620 | 15 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
620 | 15 | 7.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 1-178.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 11-201.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 13-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 13C-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-405.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-412 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-413 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3774&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3774.htm |