IL HB3770 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $466,568,200 to the Illinois Student Assistance Commission for the Monetary Award Program. Effective July 1, 2015.
Title
$EDUCATION-ISAC-MAP
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Scherer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016 |
2016-01-03 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016 |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3770&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/PDF/09900HB3770.pdf |