IL HB3757 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fish and Aquatic Life Code. In provisions concerning the value of protected species, removes the phrase "protected by this Code" from the provisions. Provides that a person who violates the Code or administrative rule (rather than only the Code) relating to specified unlawful actions concerning protected species valued in excess of a total of $300 commits a Class 3 felony. Adds bowfin and paddlefish to a species list with a $4 per pound or $8 per pound fair market value or replacement cost. Removes bowfin from a species list for species with a $1 per pound fair market value or replacement cost.
Title
FISH-PROTECTED SPECIES
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Meier [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 28, 2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 099-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
515 | 5 | 5-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |