IL HB3755 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that no rail carrier shall operate a train or light engine used in connection with the movement of freight unless it has an operating crew consisting of at least 2 individuals. Provides that the minimum freight train crew size shall remain in effect until a federal law or rule encompassing the subject matter has been adopted. Grants the Illinois Commerce Commission the power to conduct evidentiary hearings, make findings, and issue and enforce orders, including sanctions, with respect to freight train crew member size. Provides that the term "train or light engine" does not include trains operated by a hostler service or utility employees.
Title
VEH CD-FREIGHT TRAIN CREW SIZE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (TR) |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-039-001 |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2016-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2016-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-008-000 |
2016-04-04 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2016-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2015-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 18c-7402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |