IL HB3752 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that as a condition to an issuance of a restricted driving permit or a reissuance of a revoked driver's license, the Secretary of State shall require the person to participate in a behavioral-based driver retraining program. Removes authority of the Secretary to cancel a restricted driving permit if the permit holder does not subsequently complete the program. Provides that upon notice of suspension of a person's driver's license, the Secretary shall give the person an option to complete a behavioral-based driver retraining program within 45 days of notice, the completion of which shall terminate the license suspension if the Secretary receives the necessary documentation from the driver retraining course provider and the person does not commit a similar driving offense within 6 months of the notice.
Title
VEH CD-DRIVER EDU PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 6-205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-208 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3752&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3752.htm |