IL HB3752 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Financial Institutions Elder Abuse Reporting Act. Provides that a financial institution shall make an abuse report if an employee of the financial institution (i) has direct contact with an elder adult or reviews or approves an elder adult's financial documents, records, or transactions in connection with financial services provided by the financial institution to or for the elder adult, and (ii) observes or obtains knowledge of behavior, unusual circumstances, or transactions that leads the employee to know or have reasonable cause to suspect that the elder adult is the victim of financial abuse. Provides that an abuse report made under the Act is confidential. Provides that a financial institution shall establish and implement a training program to (i) assist employees in recognizing signs of potential financial abuse of an elder adult and (ii) inform employees about the requirement to file abuse reports provided by the Act. Provides for civil penalties for failure to file an abuse report.
Title
FINANCIAL INST-ELDER ABUSE
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Winger [R] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] |
Rep. Arthur Turner [D] | Rep. Sue Scherer [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2015-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christine Winger |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3752&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3752.htm |