IL HB3751 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Authorizes the Department to create a special raffle to benefit the Illinois Veterans Assistance Fund. Defines "raffle" as a game of chance in which a limited number of tickets are sold in numeric order, each having a chance of winning a prize, and the winner or winners are determined after the conclusion of ticket sales by a computerized random number generator at a time to be referred to as the raffle drawing date. Sets forth guidelines for conducting the special raffle. Amends the Raffles Act and the Criminal Code of 2012 to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
RAFFLES-VETERANS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-13 | House | To Finance Subcommittee |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D. Anthony |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1605 | 21.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1605 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 15 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 28-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3751&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3751.htm |