IL HB3739 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Safeguarding Sanctuary Cities Act. Provides that if a unit of local government has in place any policy that limits or restricts compliance with a detainer or otherwise does not comply with a detainer, any grant of State funds that the unit of local government would otherwise receive may not be reduced or not made available to that unit of local government by reason of noncompliance with immigration detainers. Defines "detainer" as any order or request by the Secretary of Homeland Security to a unit of local government official: (1) to temporarily hold a person in the custody of that State or unit of local government until such person may be taken into federal custody; (2) to transport such a person for transfer to federal custody; or (3) to notify the Secretary of Homeland Security prior to the release of such a person.
Title
SAFEGUARDING SANCTUARY CITIES
Sponsors
Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] | Rep. Daniel Burke [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] | Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] |
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-21 | House | To Local Government Subcommittee |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3739&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3739.htm |