IL HB3734 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes it unlawful to deliver, sell, or purchase or cause to be delivered, sold, or purchased or cause to be possessed by another, an assault weapon, assault weapon attachment, .50 caliber rifle, or .50 caliber cartridge. Makes it unlawful for any person to knowingly possess an assault weapon, .50 caliber rifle, or .50 caliber cartridge 300 days after the effective date of this amendatory Act, except possession of weapons registered with the State Police in the time provided. Provides exemptions and penalties. Prohibits delivery, sale, purchase or possession of large capacity ammunition feeding devices. Provides exemptions and penalties.
Title
CRIM CD ASSAULT WEAPONS BAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-10-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-10-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-10-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2017-08-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-07-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-07-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-07-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-03-15 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2017-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-1.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 5 | 24-1.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3734&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3734.htm |