IL HB3729 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a person who is an elected municipal official shall not be considered a participating employee, unless (1) the person has elected to become a participating employee; (2) the governing body has filed a resolution certifying that a person in that position is expected to work more than 600 hours (or 1,000 hours if the participating municipality has adopted a specified resolution); and (3) the person has submitted logs evidencing that he or she has met the hourly standard. Requires the resolution to be adopted and filed with the Fund no more than 90 days after the general election in which any municipal official was elected. Provides that with respect to a participant who holds elected municipal office on the effective date, the resolution requirement does not affect participation by that elected municipal official with respect to that term of office until 90 days after the effective date. Contains provisions specifying the manner of documenting and submitting the time spent on official government business. Provides that an elected municipal official who fails to submit time sheets or fails to conduct official government business for either 600 or 1,000 hours (whichever is applicable) with respect to that position shall not be permitted to continue participation in the Fund as an elected municipal official. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PENCD-IMRF-MUNICIPAL OFFICIALS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2017-07-06HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-06-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-06-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-06-28HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-06-25HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-06-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-06-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-06-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-06-24HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-06-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4057-137Amended CodeCitation Text
4057-137.3New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback