IL HB3721 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Replaces references to "naturopathic physician" with "naturopathic doctor". Authorizes licensees under the Act to only use certain titles. Adds a provision requiring naturopathic doctors to enter into written collaborative agreements with collaborating physicians. Makes changes to the authorized scope of practice for naturopathic doctors. Removes provisions amending the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Further amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Authorizes physicians to collaborate with a naturopathic doctor in accordance with the requirements of the Naturopathic Medical Practice Act. Effective immediately.
Title
NATUROPATHIC MEDICAL PRACTICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 007-004-000 |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |