IL HB3713 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-07 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-07 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Board of Education Article of the School Code. Provides that the State Board shall require all school districts to supply all active classroom instructors, all school staff and administration, and district leadership with an educational document, in a PDF and a physical format, explaining at a minimum the values of good indoor air quality, including peer-reviewed research demonstrating effects of poor and good indoor air quality, an explanation of airborne transmission of pathogens and other airborne substances, a basic explanation of air changes per hour and relation to outdoor air and filtered air, best practice recommendations for the portable air cleaner and the air quality monitor, including guidance on theory, function, placement, and operation of the monitor. Provides that the State Board shall require all school districts to ensure that all active classrooms that are not mechanically ventilated have at least 2 properly functioning windows, or one window in situations where only one is present, that can open and can safely stay open. Provides that the State Board shall require all school districts to ensure that all active classrooms are equipped with an air quality monitor that meets specified requirements. Provides that the State Board shall require all school districts to ensure that all active classrooms are equipped with a portable air cleaner that meets specified requirements. Provides that the State Board shall require all school districts to supply each school with 5 additional portable air cleaners and 5 additional air quality monitors to be used in school health offices, libraries, cafeterias, and other similar spaces. Provides that the State Board shall require all school districts to undertake a ventilation verification assessment of all mechanical ventilation systems in the school district performed by a certified assessor or a mechanical engineer. Makes other changes.
Title
SCH CD-VENTILATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2023-10-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2023-10-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2023-10-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2023-08-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Appropriations- Education |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations- Education |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations- Education |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2023-03-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-035-000 |
2023-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2023-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2023-03-23 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Matt Hanson |
2023-03-23 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2023-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-002-000 |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-002-000 |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2023-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2023-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-003-000 |
2023-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-003-000 |
2023-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2023-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |