IL HB3712 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Small Donor Democracy Matching System for Fair Elections Act. Amends the Election Code. Creates a small donor campaign contribution matching system for candidates for the offices of Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Attorney General, State Comptroller, State Treasurer, Secretary of State, State Senator, and State Representative. Creates the Small Donor Democracy Matching Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Sets forth requirements for accessing the small donor matching system. Sets forth provisions for the funding of the matching contributions. Imposes limits on the access to matching funds. Allows the General Assembly to increase various amounts, subject to public referendum. Provides for penalties for violations of the provisions. Sets forth disclosure requirements. Creates the Campaign Finance Board within the State Board of Elections to implement the campaign contribution matching system. Includes severability provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-CONTRIBUTION MATCHING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 9-25.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-65 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-70 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 9A heading | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3712&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3712.htm |