IL HB3709 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-5)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code. Provides that counseling services or psychotherapy on an outpatient basis provided to a minor 12 years of age or older must be provided by, or under the supervision of, a licensed service provider. Provides that until the consent of the minor's parent, legal guardian, or person in loco parentis has been obtained, outpatient counseling or psychotherapy provided to a minor under the age of 18 (rather than 17) shall be initially limited to not more than 8 90-minute sessions (rather than 5 sessions, a session lasting not more than 45 minutes). Provides that after the eighth session, the service provider shall consider specified statutory factors throughout the therapeutic process to determine, through consultation with the minor, whether attempting to obtain the consent of a parent, guardian, or person in loco parentis would be detrimental to the minor's well-being. Provides that obtaining the consent of a parent, guardian, or person in loco parentis shall be presumed to be detrimental to the minor's well-being for counseling services or psychotherapy related to allegations of neglect, sexual abuse, or mental or physical abuse by the minor's parent, guardian, or person in loco parentis. Provides that the minor's parent, guardian or person in loco parentis shall not be liable for the out-of-pocket costs, including co-payments, deductibles, or co-insurance (rather than costs)for outpatient counseling or psychotherapy which is received by the minor without the consent of the minor's parent, guardian, or person in loco parentis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MHDDC-MINOR-OUTPATIENT-THERAPY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-26HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 037-018-000
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-003-001
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-000-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-04-27HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-27HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 013-000-000
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee
2017-03-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee
2017-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 020-000-000
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee
2017-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40553-501Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback