IL HB3704 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that services provided by the Department of Corrections for transitional and post-release treatment programs for juveniles committed to the Department shall include family engagement, including, but not limited to, visitation and programming. Provides that the Department shall designate those institutions and facilities which shall be maintained for persons assigned as adults (rather than adults and juveniles).
Title
CD CORR-JUVENILES
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] | Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] | Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst [R] | Sen. Heather Steans [D] |
Sen. Dale Righter [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-07 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0219 |
2019-08-07 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-07 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-007-000 |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2019-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-2.5-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-6-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |