IL HB3702 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-29 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. Provides that a superintendent of a department of public works shall be a registered professional engineer, hold a degree in engineering from an accredited institution of higher learning, or have at least 10 years of professional, management-level experience in either a municipal or county public works department (rather than the superintendent shall be a registered professional engineer). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EMERGENCY TELEPHONE SYSTEM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-29HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-10-20HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2021-10-20HouseArrived in House
2021-10-20SenateThird Reading - Passed; 037-019-000
2021-10-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2021-10-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Johnson
2021-10-20SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-10-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 006-003-000
2021-10-20SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-10-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 20, 2021
2021-10-19SenateSecond Reading
2021-10-19SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2021-10-19SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2021-10-19SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-10-19SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Adriane Johnson
2021-10-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2021-10-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-10-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson
2021-10-13SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021
2021-10-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading October 19, 2021
2021-10-13SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2021-05-19SenateWaive Posting Notice
2021-05-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-05-13SenateFirst Reading
2021-05-13SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2021-05-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-05-13SenateArrive in Senate
2021-05-13HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-05-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-05-13HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Public Utilities Committee; 023-000-000
2021-05-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Public Utilities Committee; 022-000-000
2021-05-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
2021-05-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
2021-05-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2021-05-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2021-05-06HouseThird Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021
2021-05-06HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-06HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2021-04-23HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-24HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2021-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2021-03-22HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 024-000-000
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Public Utilities Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026052605-53Amended CodeCitation Text
5075010Amended CodeCitation Text
5075010.1Amended CodeCitation Text
5075010.3Amended CodeCitation Text
5075013Repealed CodeCitation Text
5075014Amended CodeCitation Text
5075015Amended CodeCitation Text
5075015.2Amended CodeCitation Text
5075015.2aAmended CodeCitation Text
5075015.4aAmended CodeCitation Text
5075015.6Amended CodeCitation Text
5075015.6aAmended CodeCitation Text
5075015.6bAmended CodeCitation Text
5075017Repealed CodeCitation Text
5075017.5Amended CodeCitation Text
5075019Amended CodeCitation Text
507502Amended CodeCitation Text
5075020Amended CodeCitation Text
507503Amended CodeCitation Text
5075030Amended CodeCitation Text
507504Amended CodeCitation Text
5075040Amended CodeCitation Text
5075045Amended CodeCitation Text
507505Amended CodeCitation Text
507506Amended CodeCitation Text
507506.1Amended CodeCitation Text
507506.2New CodeSee Bill Text
507507Amended CodeCitation Text
507507.1New CodeSee Bill Text
507508Amended CodeCitation Text
507509Repealed CodeCitation Text
5075099Amended CodeCitation Text
720526-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback