IL HB3699 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Alcoholism and Other Drug Abuse and Dependency Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the election of treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 016-001-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Mental Health Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-28HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-03-28HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Mental Health Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee
2017-03-27HouseRe-assigned to Mental Health Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2030140-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback