IL HB3699 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Board of Higher Education for its FY12 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2011.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$BD HIGHER ED-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2012-07-27HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2012-03-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2012-03-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2012-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2012-02-28HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2011-07-23HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2011-03-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2011-03-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2011-03-01HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2011-03-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2011-03-01HouseFirst Reading
2011-02-25HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
2011-02-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback