IL HB3695 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that the State Board of Elections and the Office of the Secretary of State shall establish an automatic voter registration program pursuant to an interagency contract and jointly-adopted rules. Provides that an application for a driver's license, other than a temporary visitor's driver's license or a State identification card, shall also serve as an application to register to vote; allow an update to registration; and perform other specified functions. Requires specified agencies to provide certain information regarding registration. Establishes designated automatic voter registration agencies; and requires the establishment of dual-purpose applications to register to vote. Sets forth provisions and requirements for the State Board of Elections regarding the program. Amends the Freedom of Information Act to exempt certain information. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC-AUTO VOTER REGISTRATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-10 | House | To Voter Education & Registration Subcommittee |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-09 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-02-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1-16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 1A-16.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 1A-16.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 1A-16.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 1A-16.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 1A-16.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 2-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3695&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3695.htm |