IL HB3695 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that a separate tax shall be levied by the Chicago Board of Education for the purpose of making an employer contribution to the Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago, at the rate of 0.26%; requires the proceeds from this separate tax to be paid directly to the Pension Fund. Makes a corresponding reduction in the rate limitation for the tax for general educational purposes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHGO BD EDUC-PENSION TAX LEVY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-10SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2015-10-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015
2015-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2015-05-22SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
2015-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2015-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2015-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2015-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland
2015-05-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2015
2015-05-07SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2015-05-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2015-05-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2015-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2015-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2015-04-29SenatePostponed - Executive
2015-04-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2015-04-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2015-04-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado
2015-04-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2015-04-22SenateAssigned to Executive
2015-04-21SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2015-04-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-04-15SenateFirst Reading
2015-04-14SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2015-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 15, 2015
2015-04-14SenateArrive in Senate
2015-04-14HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-009-000
2015-03-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2015-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2015-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2015-03-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2015-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2015-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2015-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2015-03-23HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2015-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2015-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2015-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2015-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2015-03-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2015-03-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2015-03-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2015-03-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2015-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2015-03-19HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-000-000
2015-03-19HouseRemains in Revenue & Finance Committee
2015-03-19HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
2015-03-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2015-03-13HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2015-03-10HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2015-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2015-02-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-02-26HouseFirst Reading
2015-02-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105534-53Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback