IL HB3687 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0521
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0521
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that upon commencement of a prosecution for a sex offense against a person known to be an employee of a school, the State's Attorney shall immediately provide the superintendent of schools or school administrator that employs the employee with a copy of the complaint, information, or indictment. Provides that the notification shall not diminish the rights, privileges, or remedies of an employee under a collective bargaining agreement or employment contract. Defines "employee" and "sex offense". Effective immediately.
Title
SEX OFFENSE-NOTICE TO SCHOOLS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0521 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2019 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 111-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |