IL HB3687 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires alternative and optional education programs for truants, the IHOPE Program, and graduation incentives programs to accept dropouts under the age of 24 (currently, under 20 for the graduation incentives programs and through the age of 21 for the IHOPE Program and the alternative and optional education programs for truants). Provides that a school district shall deny reenrollment in its secondary schools to any child 19 years of age or above who has dropped out of school and who could not attend classes during the normal school year and graduate before his or her twenty-fourth birthday (currently, his or her twenty-first birthday). Effective immediately.
Title
SCH-DROPOUT PROGRAMS-AGE LIMIT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-02 - House - Motion in House (Y: 70 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-12-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-12-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-12-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-038-000 |
2015-12-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-12-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-12-02 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-12-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2015-12-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2015-12-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-10-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015 |
2015-09-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015 |
2015-09-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-09-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-09-02 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2015-09-02 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2015-09-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-08-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015 |
2015-07-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2015 |
2015-07-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-07-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-07-15 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2015 |
2015-07-15 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2015-04-24 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-04-20 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-30 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2015-03-24 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ron Sandack |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2015-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Youth & Young Adults; 011-001-000 |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Youth & Young Adults |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.66 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.66b | Amended Code | Citation Text |