IL HB3682 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-08-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the COVID-19 Workplace Vaccination Program Limitation Act. Provides that it is unlawful for an employer in the State of Illinois to create, implement, or otherwise enforce a workplace vaccination program that requires any employee to demonstrate to the employer that he or she has received a vaccine that was approved under emergency use authorization by the United States Food and Drug Administration. Provides for repeal of the Act on January 1, 2023. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19 WORK VACCINE LIMIT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2021-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-24HouseTo Business & Innovation Subcommittee
2021-03-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2021-03-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg
2021-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2021-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2021-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2021-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2021-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2021-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2021-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
2021-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2021-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2021-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2021-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
2021-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2021-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback