IL HB3680 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Adds 3,4-Dichloro-N-[2-(dimethylamino)cyclohexyl]-N-methylbenzamide (some trade or other name: pink; U-47700) as a Schedule I controlled substance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONTROLLED SUB-U-47700

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-03-20HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-20HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720570204Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback