IL HB3680 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Adds 3,4-Dichloro-N-[2-(dimethylamino)cyclohexyl]-N-methylbenzamide (some trade or other name: pink; U-47700) as a Schedule I controlled substance.
Title
CONTROLLED SUB-U-47700
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] |
Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Sen. John Connor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-03-20 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-20 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3680&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3680.htm |