IL HB3670 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0297
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0297
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State shall immediately revoke the license, permit, or driving privileges of any driver convicted of any offense against any provision in this Code, or any local ordinance, regulating the movement of traffic when that offense is the direct (rather than proximate) cause of the death of any person.
Title
VEH CD-REVOCATION OF LICENSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0297 |
2015-08-06 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-08-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael Noland |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2015 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-025-000 |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 005-002-000 |
2015-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2015-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 005-001-000 |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 6-205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |