IL HB3668 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Egg and Egg Products Act. Provides that nest run eggs must be held and transported at or below 45 degrees Fahrenheit ambient temperature beginning 36 hours after the time of lay (rather than shall be held at 60 degrees Fahrenheit or less at all times, and during transportation the egg temperature may not exceed 45 degrees Fahrenheit). Effective immediately.
Title
EGG/EGG PRODUCTS-NEST RUN EGGS
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] | Rep. Monica Bristow [D] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] |
Rep. Avery Bourne [R] | Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0158 |
2019-07-26 | House | Effective Date July 26, 2019 |
2019-07-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-000-000 |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 615 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |