IL HB3658 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0193
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Property Control Act. In provisions concerning the permanent record a responsible officer must maintain of items of State property, sets the definition of "nominal value", below which a responsible officer need not maintain a permanent record of the items, as $5,000 or less. Allows the administrator to set a higher limit by rule. Provides that nothing in the provisions shall be construed as relieving responsible officers of the duty to reasonably ensure that State property is not subject to theft. Provides that physical inventory checks only need to be made for property not of nominal value.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE PROPERTY-INVENTORY LIMIT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0193
2017-08-18HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-18HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2017
2017-05-11SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-20SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2017-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-20SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-017-000
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-05HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-001-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
306056.02Amended CodeCitation Text
306056.04Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback