IL HB3656 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-25 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Flue Gas Desulfurization (FGD) Task Force Act. Creates the FGD Task Force to study the cost benefits of and make recommendations for the construction of new stacks at coal-fired power plants with flue gas desulfurization scrubber technology and the conversion of existing stacks at coal-fired power plants to flue gas desulfurization scrubber technology for the purpose of safely burning more Illinois-mined coal. Provides for the membership of the Task Force and provides that members shall serve without compensation. Requires the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly by December 31, 2017. Requires the Department of Natural Resources and the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency to provide administrative and other support to the Task Force. Repeals the Act on January 1, 2019. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FGD TASK FORCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-25 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-25HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-25House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-25HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 080-015-002
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Energy Committee; 009-001-000
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Energy Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-28HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar
2017-05-24SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 009-000-000
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
2017-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 19, 2017
2017-05-18SenateDo Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 007-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-11SenatePostponed - Energy and Public Utilities
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Energy and Public Utilities
2017-04-05SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-05SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 5, 2017
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-03-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-038-002
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Energy Committee; 012-000-000
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Energy Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback