IL HB3652 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Personal Information Protection Act. Expands the scope of the Act to cover private contact information (home address, home or personal phone number, personal e-mail address). Limits the transfer of private contact information.
Title
LIMIT TRANSFER OF PERSONAL INF
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-19 | House | To General Law Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 530 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 530 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 530 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 530 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 530 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3652&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3652.htm |